+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 383, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On September 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3364.).
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 12).
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2351.).
On August 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 19).
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1488.)
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 14, 2017: AB 798 GARCIA, E. Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 79
September 12, 2017: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 9
August 31, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # AB798 Eduardo Garcia By Hueso Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
July 19, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 11, 2017: AB 798 GARCIA, E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 3, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor