+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (37)
On September 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 493, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6451.).
On August 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5342.).
On August 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28).
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 15).
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3476.)
On January 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- (pending re-refer to Com. on HEALTH.)
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3366.)
On January 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Reconsideration granted.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1320.)
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 845.)
- Re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (12)
August 30, 2016: AB 796 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 24, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB796 Nazarian By Pan
- Yeas: 39
August 11, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
June 15, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 25, 2016: AB 796 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
January 21, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
January 12, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
May 7, 2015: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 14
May 5, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
May 5, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor