+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2925.).
On August 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2340.).
On August 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1488.)
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18).
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 5, 2017: AB 794 GALLAGHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
August 31, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB794 Gallagher By Hertzberg
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 11, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 14, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 11, 2017: AB 794 GALLAGHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 3, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2017: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor