+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Cannella.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (July 2).
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and APPR.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 4. Page 1575.)
On May 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6).
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 15).
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
August 12, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 2, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 11
May 23, 2013: AB 793 GRAY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 9
May 6, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
April 15, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 3