+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 589, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2870.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2859.)
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2408.).
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 30).
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1348.)
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29).
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 13).
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 3, 2015: AB 793 QUIRK Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
September 2, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB793 Quirk By Hill
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 30, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
June 30, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
May 7, 2015: AB 793 QUIRK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 7, 2015: AB 793 QUIRK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 29, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 13, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor