+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (33)
On January 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 12. Page 3610.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 2947.).
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2690.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 3).
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 15. Page 1876.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16).
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 8).
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 14, 2019: AB 792 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 7
September 13, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB792 Ting et al. By Skinner
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 3, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2019: AB 792 Ting Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 15
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2