+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1150.)
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
On April 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 24, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 11, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
April 29, 2013: AB 790 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 2, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor