+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 201, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2631.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.)
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2245.).
On August 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1717.) (June 29).
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1071.)
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13).
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On March 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
September 1, 2021: AB 788 Calderon Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2021: Special Consent AB788
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 29, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 11
June 8, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
April 19, 2021: AB 788 Calderon Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
April 7, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor