+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 487, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3299.).
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2356.).
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1478.)
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8).
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 12, 2013: AB 787 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
September 11, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB787 Stone By Yee
- Yeas: 39
August 30, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
August 19, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 7
June 11, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 6
May 16, 2013: AB 787 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 9
May 8, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 23, 2013: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
April 16, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor