+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mendoza.
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 15).
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1565.)
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13).
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 15, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
July 15, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 22, 2015: AB 783 DALY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
May 22, 2015: AB 783 DALY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
May 13, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor