+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 181, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2716.).
On July 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1878.).
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1361.)
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 25).
On February 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 15, 2019: AB 782 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
July 1, 2019: Consent Calendar AB782
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 5, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 25, 2019: AB 782 Berman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 10, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor