+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 379, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2924.).
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2102.).
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1591.)
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8).
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 6, 2013: AB 779 BOCANEGRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
September 3, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB779 Bocanegra By Padilla
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2013: AB 779 BOCANEGRA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 6
May 8, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 24, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1