+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 18, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 19, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 3, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 29, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 28).
On January 26, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 4, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On December 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 14.
On December 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
March 28, 2023: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor