+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 779, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 2613.).
On August 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2150.).
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 8).
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and L. & I.R.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 1903.)
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 1904.)
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 27).
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (April 27).
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
- Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (11)
August 27, 2015: AB 768 THURMOND Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 3
August 24, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB768 Thurmond By Leno
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
July 8, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 29, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
June 29, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
June 4, 2015: AB 768 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 2
May 27, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor