+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 710, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3293.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.)
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2705.).
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On August 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On July 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12).
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13).
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1391.)
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 21).
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 13, 2017: AB 766 FRIEDMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
September 11, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB766 Friedman By Mitchell
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 13, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 4, 2017: AB 766 FRIEDMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 26, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
March 21, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor