+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 704, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2847.).
On September 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2391.).
On August 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 13).
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1330.)
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28).
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
September 7, 2021: AB 764 Cervantes Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
September 3, 2021: Special Consent AB764
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
August 16, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 13, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
May 6, 2021: AB 764 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
April 28, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 13, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor