+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 26, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
On June 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1543.).
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 7).
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1156.)
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15).
On March 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On March 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (4)
June 17, 2021: Consent Calendar AB761
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 7, 2021: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
April 22, 2021: AB 761 Chen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
April 15, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor