+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On January 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor