+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 494, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3582.).
On September 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2930.).
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2745.)
- From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 10)
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1).
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1476.)
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2).
On February 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 14, 2019: AB 754 Grayson Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
September 13, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB754 Grayson et al. By Hill
- Yeas: 40
September 10, 2019: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
June 11, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
May 2, 2019: AB 754 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 24, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
April 2, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor