+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (35)
On October 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 683, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3094.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2464.).
On August 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and EQ.
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 4. Page 2155.)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 16).
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
On May 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
On May 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On February 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
September 9, 2019: AB 753 Eduardo Garcia Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 79
September 3, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB753 Eduardo Garcia By Stone Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 40
May 30, 2019: AB 753 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 20
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 22, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor