+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 708, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3132.).
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2565.).
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11).
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21).
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1720.)
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 17).
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 11, 2017: AB 752 RUBIO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
September 7, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB752 Rubio et al. By Lara
- Yeas: 40
September 1, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 11, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 21, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 26, 2017: AB 752 RUBIO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 17, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 25, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor