+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On October 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 808, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 22. Page 3031.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 2462.).
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 25).
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 19. Page 1481.)
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 9).
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On February 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 5, 2019: AB 749 Mark Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 11
September 3, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB749 Mark Stone et al. By Durazo
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 6
June 25, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
May 2, 2019: AB 749 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 20
April 9, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
April 9, 2019: Noes: Gallagher, Kiley, Obernolte
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3