+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 682, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3307.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2712.).
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9).
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1941.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 10, 2019: AB 748 Gipson Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
September 9, 2019: Special Consent AB748
- Yeas: 40
August 30, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 9, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 24, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
May 23, 2019: AB 748 Gipson Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 18
April 2, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
March 26, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor