+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (40)
On September 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 668, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 5. Page 7165.).
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 31).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 7122.)
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6090.).
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 29).
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
- Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 5853.)
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5779.)
- Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5777.)
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On September 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
On August 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5).
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 11. Page 1711.)
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 8).
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and L. GOV.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 31, 2018: AB 747 Caballero Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 6
August 31, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB747 Caballero By Hertzberg
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 31, 2018: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 3
August 29, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
July 5, 2017: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 26, 2017: AB 747 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 8
May 8, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
May 3, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor