+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 277, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2284.).
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1515.)
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 23).
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On February 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 26, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB746 Wood By McGuire
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
July 3, 2019: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 6, 2019: AB 746 Wood Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 23, 2019: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
April 23, 2019: Noes:
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor