+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 867, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3562.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 2919.).
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 2733.)
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1941.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On February 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 13, 2019: AB 744 Aguiar-Curry Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
September 13, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB744 Aguiar-Curry By Dodd
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
August 30, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 3, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2019: AB 744 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 18
April 23, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1