+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (36)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on INS., E., U. & C. and GOV. & F.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2125.).
- Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 2125.)
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 2049.)
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On April 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 10, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
June 26, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 3
May 29, 2019: AB 740 Burke Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 4
April 24, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 2