+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 400, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5213.).
On August 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From special consent calendar.
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED., JUD. and HUMAN S.
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 3371.)
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 16. Page 3365.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20).
On January 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On January 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 12).
On April 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2022: AB 740 McCarty Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB740 McCarty et al. By Pan
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 14, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
June 1, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 24, 2022: AB 740 McCarty Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Present/NV: 11
January 20, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
January 12, 2022: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1