+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (37)
On September 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 410, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 4. Page 3059.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3047.)
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 9).
- Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2496.).
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 26).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 12).
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1717.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On February 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On February 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On December 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (9)
September 9, 2021: AB 74 GONZALEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
September 9, 2021: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
September 8, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB74 Lorena Gonzalez et a By Hueso
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
August 16, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 12, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 2
June 1, 2021: AB 74 Lorena Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 15, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor