+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 553, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6464.).
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5369.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 11).
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On July 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1716.)
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2016: AB 736 COOLEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 24, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB736 Cooley By Morrell
- Yeas: 39
June 27, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 13, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
June 1, 2015: AB 736 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor