+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1934.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
July 17, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
May 31, 2017: AB 735 MAIENSCHEIN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 26, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
March 21, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
March 21, 2017: No Votes Recorded:
- Yeas: 15