+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 220, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4872.).
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3508.)
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21).
On January 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On January 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and HIGHER ED.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 11, 2016: Consent Calendar 2nd AB735 Ridley-Thomas
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 29, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
January 27, 2016: AB 735 RIDLEY-THOMAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
January 12, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
January 5, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor