+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
On January 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
April 28, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2015: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor