+ − Summaries (15)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (57)
On September 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 492, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6534.).
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 30).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6474.)
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 5488.).
On August 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5451.)
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 5433.)
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 29).
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From inactive file.
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hancock.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (September 10).
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2646.)
- Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2645.)
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hernandez.
On August 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 17).
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1107.).
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On December 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
On December 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (12)
August 31, 2016: AB 72 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2016: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 3
August 29, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB72 Bonta By Hernandez
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
August 8, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 29, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
August 17, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 15, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
July 15, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
April 23, 2015: AB 72 BONTA Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
April 15, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1