+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 24, 2017: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor