+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 616, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 3036.).
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2187.).
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 12).
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 18).
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and RLS.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 18. Page 1461.)
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8).
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 8).
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 9, 2013: AB 719 HERNÁNDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 2
September 6, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB719 Roger Hernández By Padilla
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
June 18, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
May 16, 2013: AB 719 HERNÁNDEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 8
May 8, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 8, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor