+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 120, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On June 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 2170.).
On June 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1615.).
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17).
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 1556.)
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13).
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 29, 2015: AB 715 DALY Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
June 25, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB715 Daly By Liu
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
May 22, 2015: AB 715 DALY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
May 13, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor