+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2916.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2915.)
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2477.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1715.)
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 4, 2015: AB 706 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
September 3, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB706 Bonilla By Gaines
- Yeas: 40
August 27, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
July 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
June 1, 2015: AB 706 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 15, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
April 15, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor