+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On January 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On January 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (January 10).
On January 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On January 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
January 10, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor