+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 197, Statutes of 2021.
On September 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 19. Page 3032.).
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2505.).
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 13).
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 5).
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 19. Page 1687.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.)
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On April 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (9)
September 9, 2021: AB 701 Lorena Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 9
September 8, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB701 Lorena Gonzalez et a By Becker
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 16, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 13, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
July 5, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
May 28, 2021: AB 701 Lorena Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 8
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 22, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2