+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 848, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6219.).
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 23).
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4877.).
On August 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1329.)
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 24, 2016: AB 701 GARCIA, C. Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 23, 2016: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 6
August 11, 2016: Special Consent AB701 Cristina Garcia By Lara
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 28, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 7, 2015: AB 701 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 15, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 21
April 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor