+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 29, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1491.).
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10).
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 854.)
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25).
On January 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On January 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On January 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On December 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
On December 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 18, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd AB7 Bonta
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 10, 2015: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2015: AB 7 BONTA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 9
March 25, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor