+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 14, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1605.).
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 4).
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1587.)
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On February 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 17, 2019: Consent Calendar AB698
- Yeas: 40
June 4, 2019: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
May 9, 2019: AB 698 Obernolte Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 1, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor