+ − Summaries (14)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (46)
On September 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 12. Page 5501.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 5498.)
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 31).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5456.)
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7.).
On August 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
On August 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On August 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
- Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
On July 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Skinner.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 18).
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1785.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 3).
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On January 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 31, 2020: AB 69 TING Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 9
August 31, 2020: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
August 30, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading AB69 Ting et al. By Hertzberg
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
August 6, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
July 1, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 18, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
May 22, 2019: AB 69 Ting Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
April 3, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor