+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 1272.).
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 14).
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1006.)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On April 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 10, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB685 Achadjian By Knight
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 9
May 14, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
April 18, 2013: AB 685 ACHADJIAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
April 9, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor