+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 746, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On September 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 3157.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 2603.).
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 12).
On July 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1695.) (June 28).
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and E.Q.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 13. Page 1844.)
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28).
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and NAT. RES.
On February 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (9)
September 10, 2021: AB 680 Burke Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 5
September 10, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB680 Burke By Bradford
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 6
August 16, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 12, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 28, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 2, 2021: AB 680 Burke Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 5
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 28, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
April 8, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor