+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On January 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2864.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2859.)
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2395.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 15).
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1885.)
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 21).
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On December 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
On December 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 3, 2015: AB 68 WALDRON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
September 2, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB68 Waldron By Hall
- Yeas: 40
August 27, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
August 24, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 15, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
July 15, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
June 3, 2015: AB 68 WALDRON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 19
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor