+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1577.)
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15).
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On April 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and HEALTH.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 12, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 3, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 9
June 19, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2013: AB 678 GORDON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
May 15, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 30, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 19
April 24, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor