+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 28).
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8).
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
April 28, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
April 8, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education]
- Yeas: 7
April 8, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor