+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and G.O.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor